Maidment, Julie Lynne (CPSO#: 82768)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 101
493 Lancaster Street West
Kitchener ON  N2K 1L8
Phone: (519) 747-2172
Fax: (519) 571-1174
Electoral District: 03
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Pinehaven Nursing Home
229 Lexington Road
Waterloo ON  N2K 2E1
Canada
Phone: 519-885-0255
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Julie Maidment Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 24 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Maidment ( CPSO# 82768 )

Business Address:
101 - 493 Lancaster Street West
Waterdown ON  N2K 1L8
Phone Number: (519) 747-2172

Business Address:
229 Lexington Road
Waterloo ON  N2K 2E1
Phone Number: (519) 885-0255

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Freeport Site Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JULIE LYNNE MAIDMENT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAIDMENT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2007