Mailo, Janette Alexandra (CPSO#: 93808)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Aug 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Aug 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Email for inquiry about medical records: jmailo@ualberta.ca
Date Received: 04 May 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 07 May 2012 to 03 Jun 2012
Elective Trainee - Palliative Care Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 07 Dec 2015 to 18 Dec 2015
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 May 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 03 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Dec 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 18 Dec 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Aug 2016
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Aug 2018