Maini, Rajiv (CPSO#: 94649)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Dec 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Dec 2010

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Swahili

Education:St. Thomas's Hospital Medical School, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Uptown Eye Specialists
Unit 401
7900 Hurontario Street
Brampton ON  L6Y 0P6
Phone: (905) 456-9500
Fax: (905) 456-9508
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

2180 Steeles Ave West
Concord
Vaughan ON  L4K 2Z5
Canada
Phone: (905) 761-7002
Fax: (905) 761-7003
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

2101 Brimley Road
Suite 109
Toronto ON  M1S 2B4
Canada
Phone: 4162920330
Fax: 4162920331
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rajiv Maini Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 09 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Maini ( CPSO# 94649 )

Business Address:
221 - 2180 Steele's Avenue West
Vaughan ON  L4K 2Z5
Phone Number: (416) 292-0330

Business Address:
109 - 2101 Brimley Road
Toronto ON  M1S 2B4
Phone Number: (416) 292-0330

Business Address:
Eye MD Institute
Unit 401
7900 Hurontario Street
Brampton ON  L6Y 0P6
Phone Number: (416) 292-0330

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Australia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,Branson Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 23 May 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RAJIV MAINI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAINI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Dec 2010

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: July 20, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

Note: This decision has been appealed to the Health Professions Appeal and Review Board.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.
Download Full Document (PDF)