Maizlin, Zeev Vladimir (CPSO#: 86130)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 01 Jul 2007

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Samara State Medical University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Z. V. Maizlin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 13 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. Z. Maizlin ( CPSO# 86130 )

Business Address:
No business address available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Alberta
British Columbia
New Brunswick

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 04 Apr 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 22 Oct 2008
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 20 Nov 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 18 Oct 2012

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 18 Oct 2012 Active View Details [+]
            Dr.  Zeev  Vladimir  Maizlin  may practise medicine independently in diagnostic
            radiology, only.