Majdi, Gitadokht (CPSO#: 95537)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi

Education:Tehran University of Medical Sciences, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Uptown Health Centre
Unit 8
9325 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 0A8
Phone: (905) 508-8876
Fax: (905) 508-1087
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

The Healthy Way Medical Diagnostic
Centre
1120 Finch Ave West,Suite 105
Toronto ON  M3J 3H7
Canada
Phone: 416 667 8498
Fax: 416 667 8478
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Avicenna Health Centre
80 Finch Ave. West Suite
North York
Toronto ON  M2N 2H4
Canada
Phone: 416 222 0909
Fax: 416 222 8292
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

York Medical
10660 Yonge St, Unit 2
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 3C9
Canada
Phone: 905-770-9096
Fax: 905-770-4703
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 21 Sep 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GITADOKHT MAJDI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAJDI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 22 Sep 2011
Assessment Verification Period - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 23 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014