Majeed, Sonilla (CPSO#: 93069)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: Gupta, Sonilla (used until: 08 Oct 2012 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Jane Furber Clinic
150 Strickland Street
Lakefield ON  K0L 2H0
Phone: 705-651-5000
Fax: 705-651-5002
Electoral District: 06
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

2727 Courtice Rd
Courtice ON  L1E3A2
Canada
Phone: 905-233-1919
Fax: 905-240-8550
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sonilla Majeed Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 20 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Majeed ( CPSO# 93069 )

Business Address:
B7 - 2727 Courtice Road
Courtice ON  L1E 3A2
Phone Number: (905) 233-1919

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SONILLA MAJEED may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAJEED is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2012