Mak, Ellen Ning (CPSO#: 29212)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:University of Toronto, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ellen N. Mak Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 14 2016

Medical Records Location

Address: 16 - 1450 O'Connor Dr Toronto, ON M4B 2T8
Instructions: Patients seeking a copy of their record please contact Dr Anna Der at the address above.
Date Received: 28 May 2018

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 1976
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 1977
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018