Mak, Michael (CPSO#: 93878)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:Queen's University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
250 College St
Toronto ON  M5T 1R8
Phone: (416) 535-8501
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

LHSC Victorial Hospital
A2-630
800 Commissioners Road East
London, Ontario
London ON  N6A 5W9
Canada
Phone: 519-685-8500
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02

506-1755 Broadway W
Vancouver BC  V6J 4S5
Canada
Phone: 778-379-3844
County: 
Electoral District: 
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michael Mak Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 02 2019

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Mak ( CPSO# 93878 )

Business Address:
250 College Street
Toronto ON  M5T 1R8
Phone Number: (416) 535-8501

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health,- Russell Street Site Toronto
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health,Queen Street Site Toronto
Centre of Addiction & Mental Health,- College Street Site Toronto
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care,London - Parkwood Hospital London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL MAK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2016 to 31 Oct 2016
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015