Mak, Peter Ho Kwong (CPSO#: 77219)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Aug 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Aug 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:University of Glasgow, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Scarborough General Hospital
Department of Anesthesia
3050 Lawrence Ave East
Toronto ON  M1P 2V5
Phone: (416) 438-2911 Ext. 8133
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Peter Mak Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 12 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Mak ( CPSO# 77219 )

Business Address:
Scarborough General Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Toronto ON  M1P 2V5
Phone Number: (416) 438-2911

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Hong Kong S A R
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 01 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PETER HO KWONG MAK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2002 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 31 Dec 2002
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Aug 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Aug 2005