Makar, Hossam Sarwat Habib (CPSO#: 77420)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Mar 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Mar 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Cairo, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 107
330 Bronte Street South
Milton ON  L9T 7X1
Phone: (905) 693-1795
Fax: (905) 693-0970
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Hossam Makar Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 14 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Makar ( CPSO# 77420 )

Business Address:
Unit 107
330 Bronte Street South
Milton ON  L9T 7X1
Phone Number: (905) 693-1795

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Milton Site Halton Healthcare Services Milton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 01 Apr 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HOSSAM SARWAT HABIB MAKAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAKAR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 May 2002 to 31 Oct 2002
International Specialist Physician - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 May 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Oct 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 21 Nov 2002
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 03 Jan 2006
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 03 Jan 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 24 Mar 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Mar 2008