Makerewich, Jacqueline Rose (CPSO#: 95433)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: Piggott, Jacqueline Rose (used until: 25 Apr 2018 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
284 Queen Street East
Suite 228
Brampton, ON
L6V1C2
Brampton ON  L6V 1C2
Phone: 905-456-7635
Fax: 905-456-7636
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

20 Lynch Street
Brampton ON  L6W 2Z8
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

1421 Hurontario Street
Mississauga ON  L5G 3H5
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

101 Humber College Blvd
Etobicoke ON  M9V 1R8
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jacqueline R. Makerewich Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 16 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Makerewich ( CPSO# 95433 )

Business Address:
228 - 284 Queen Street East
Brampton ON  L6V 1C2
Phone Number: (905) 456-7635

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre,for Integrated Health and Wellness Brampton
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JACQUELINE ROSE MAKEREWICH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAKEREWICH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Plastic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Plastic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Plastic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Plastic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 31 Jul 2017
Clinical Fellow - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016