Makh, Dalbir Singh (CPSO#: 87890)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Sep 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Sep 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of London, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jul 2018 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DALBIR SINGH MAKH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAKH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 20 Nov 2007 to 04 Dec 2007
PEAP - Resident - Trauma

McMaster University, 05 Dec 2007 to 07 Dec 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Trauma

McMaster University, 09 Nov 2009 to 23 Nov 2009
PEAP - Resident - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 20 Nov 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Dec 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 07 Dec 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 09 Nov 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Nov 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Sep 2018