Makhdoom, Sohail (CPSO#: 87799)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Oct 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 11 Oct 2007

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Urdu

Education:University of Karachi, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
600 Sanatorium Road
London ON  N6H 3W7
Phone: (519) 858-2774 Ext. 2504
Fax: (519) 858-1917
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sohail Makhdoom Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 29 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Makhdoom ( CPSO# 87799 )

Business Address:
600 Sanatorium Road
2nd Floor
London ON  N6H 3W7
Phone Number: (519) 858-2774

Business Address:
800 Comissioners Road East
London ON  N6C 2R6
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 11 Oct 2007 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 11 Oct 2007
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 11 Oct 2007
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 17 May 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 26 Sep 2017

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 26 Sep 2017 Active View Details [+]
            (1 of 2)
            As  from  September 26, 2017, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation  on  the certificate of registration held by Dr. Sohail Makhdoom, in
            accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Makhdoom to the College
            of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:


                        UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
                                          ("Undertaking")
                  
                                                of
                  
                                    DR. SOHAIL MAKHDOOM
                                          ("Dr. Makhdoom")
                  
                                                to 
                  
                        COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                          (the "College")
                  
                  
                  
            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means  the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated  Health  Professions  Act,  1991,  S.O.  1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "ICR Committee" means the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports  Committee of
                  the College;
                  
                  "NMS"  means  the  Drug Program Services Branch, the Narcotics Monitoring
                  System implemented under the Narcotics Safety and Awareness Act, 2010;

                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;
                  
                  "Public Register" means  the  College's register that is available to the
                  public.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Makhdoom, certificate of registration number 87799, am a member of
                  the College.  The College has received  information regarding my standard
                  of practice.

            (3)   I, Dr. Makhdoom, acknowledge that the College  initiated an investigation
                  bearing File Number 7215771 (the "Investigation")  into  my  standard  of
                  practice.



            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (4)   I,   Dr.   Makhdoom,  undertake  to  abide  by  the  provisions  of  this
                  Undertaking, effective immediately.

            (5)   Clinical Supervision 

                  (a)   I, Dr.  Makhdoom  ,  undertake  to practise under the guidance of a
                        clinical  supervisor   acceptable to  the  College  (the  "Clinical
                        Supervisor"), for six (6) months ("Clinical Supervision"). 
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Makhdoom, acknowledge  that  I  have  reviewed  the Clinical
                        Supervisor's  undertaking,  attached  hereto  as Appendix "A",  and
                        understand  what  is  required  of  the  Clinical  Supervisor.  The
                        Clinical Supervisor will, at minimum: 
                  
                        (i)   Facilitate   the   education   program   set   out   in   the
                              Individualized  Education  Plan  ("IEP"),  attached hereto as
                              Appendix "B";
                  
                        (ii)  Meet  with  me  at my Practice Location, or another  location
                              approved by the College, once every month;
                  
                        (iii) Review at least fifteen  (15)  of  my patient charts at every
                              meeting. If fewer than fifteen (15)  charts are available for
                              review, the Clinical Supervisor will review  all  my  patient
                              charts. I undertake that a minimum of ten (10) charts will be
                              available for review in any given month;
                  
                        (iv)  Discuss any concerns arising from the chart reviews;
                  
                        (v)   Make  recommendations  to  me  for  practice improvements and
                              ongoing  professional  development  and   inquire   into   my
                              compliance with the recommendations; 
                  
                        (vi)  Perform  any  other duties, such as reviewing other documents
                              or conducting interviews  with  staff or colleagues, that the
                              Clinical   Supervisor   deem   necessary   to   my   Clinical
                              Supervision; and
                  
                        (vii) Submit written reports to the College  at  least  once  every
                              quarter,  or  more  frequently if the Clinical Supervisor has
                              concerns about my standard of practice.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Makhdoom, acknowledge  that  the  charts  reviewed  shall be
                        selected by the Clinical Supervisor based on the educational  needs
                        identified in the IEP, attached hereto as Appendix "B", as well  as
                        the  areas  of  concern  identified  in  the  report of the medical
                        assessor dated May 29, 2016, and concerns that may arise during the
                        period of Clinical Supervision.
                  
                  (d)   I,  Dr.  Makhdoom, undertake to cooperate fully with  the  Clinical
                        Supervision  of  my  practice,  conducted  under  the  term of this
                        Undertaking and Appendix "A" to this Undertaking, and to  abide  by
                        the recommendations of my Clinical Supervisor(s), including but not
                        limited  to,  any  recommended  practice  improvements  and ongoing
                        professional development.
                  
                  (e)   I,  Dr.  Makhdoom,  undertake  to ensure that Appendix "A" to  this
                        Undertaking is signed and delivered  to  the  College within thirty
                        (30) days of the date I execute this Undertaking.
                  
                  (f)   I,  Dr.  Makhdoom,  undertake  that if a person who  has  given  an
                        undertaking  in  Appendix  "A" to this  Undertaking  is  unable  or
                        unwilling to continue to fulfill  its  provisions,  I shall, within
                        twenty  (20) days of receiving notice of same, obtain  an  executed
                        undertaking  in the same form from a similarly qualified person who
                        is acceptable to the College and ensure that it is delivered to the
                        College within that time.
                  
                  (g)   I, Dr. Makhdoom, undertake that if I am unable to obtain a Clinical
                        Supervisor on  the  provisions set out under sections (5)(e) and/or
                        (f) above, I will cease  practising  medicine  until such time as I
                        have obtained a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College.  
                  
                  (h)   I,  Dr.  Makhdoom,  acknowledge  that  if  I am required  to  cease
                        practise as a result of section (5)(g) above this will constitute a
                        term, condition or limitation on my certificate of registration and
                        that term, condition or limitation will be included  on  the Public
                        Register.
                  
            (6)   Reassessment of Practice

                  (a)   I, Dr. Makhdoom, undertake that, approximately six (6) months after
                        the  completion of the Clinical Supervision set out in section  (5)
                        above  and  Appendix  "A"  to  this Undertaking, I will submit to a
                        reassessment of my practice ("the  Reassessment") by an assessor or
                        assessors   selected  by  the  College  (the   "Assessor(s)").    I
                        acknowledge that  the  Reassessment  may  include  a  chart review,
                        direct  observation  of  my  care,  interviews with colleagues  and
                        co-workers,  feedback  from patients and  any  other  tools  deemed
                        necessary by the College.
                  
                  (b)   I,  Dr.  Makhdoom,  undertake   to   co-operate   fully   with  the
                        Reassessment, conducted under the term of this Undertaking. 
                  
                  (c)   I,  Dr.  Makhdoom,  acknowledge that my Clinical Supervisor(s)  may
                        receive and review the findings of the Assessor(s), and may discuss
                        with the Assessor(s)  any  issues  or  concerns  arising  from  the
                        Reassessment.    I   also  acknowledge  that  the  results  of  the
                        Reassessment will be provided to me and reported to the College and
                        the report may form the basis of further action by the College. 
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Makhdoom, acknowledge  that  if I am of the view that any of
                        the Assessor(s)'s recommendations are  unreasonable,  I  will  have
                        thirty (30) days following my receipt of the recommendations within
                        which to provide the College with my submissions in this regard.  I
                        further   acknowledge  that  thereafter,  the  ICR  Committee  will
                        consider my  submissions and make a determination regarding whether
                        or not the recommendations,  or  any of them, are reasonable and if
                        so,  whether  they,  or  any  of them,  constitute  limitations  or
                        restrictions on my practice, and  that decision will be provided to
                        me. 
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Makhdoom, undertake that, following  the decision referenced
                        in section (6)(d) above, I will abide by those  recommendations  of
                        the   Assessor(s)   that  the  ICR  Committee  has  determined  are
                        reasonable. 
                  
                  (f)   I, Dr. Makhdoom, hereby  consent to the following being included on
                        the  Public Register as terms,  conditions  or  limitations  on  my
                        certificate  of registration, for the purposes of section 23 of the
                        Code: 
                  
                        (i)   any  recommendations   of   the  Assessor(s)  which  the  ICR
                              Committee  has  identified  in  its  decision  referenced  in
                              section  (6)(d) as terms, conditions  or  limitations  on  my
                              practice.
                  
            (7)   Monitoring 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Makhdoom,  undertake to inform the College of each and every
                        location that I practise  or  have  privileges,  including, but not
                        limited   to,   hospital(s),  clinic(s)  and  office(s),   in   any
                        jurisdiction (collectively  my "Practice Location(s)"), within five
                        (5) days of executing this Undertaking.   Going  forward, I further
                        undertake  to  inform  the  College  of  any  and all new  Practice
                        Locations  within  five  (5)  days of commencing practice  at  that
                        location.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Makhdoom, undertake that I will submit to, and not interfere
                        with,  unannounced  inspections  of  my  Practice  Location(s)  and
                        patient records by a College representative  for  the  purposes  of
                        monitoring my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Makhdoom, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                        appropriate  enquiries  of  OHIP,  NMS  and/or  any  person  who or
                        institution  that  may  have relevant information, in order for the
                        College  to  monitor my compliance  with  the  provisions  of  this
                        Undertaking. 
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Makhdoom, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP  and NMS
                        consent forms,  attached  hereto  as Appendix "C" and Appendix "D",
                        respectively. 
                  
                  
                  
            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (8)   I, Dr. Makhdoom, acknowledge that all appendices  attached to or referred
                  to in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (9)   I,  Dr.  Makhdoom,  acknowledge  and  undertake  that I shall  be  solely
                  responsible  for  payment  of  all fees, costs, charges,  expenses,  etc.
                  arising  from  the implementation  of  any  of  the  provisions  of  this
                  Undertaking. 

            (10)  I,  Dr. Makhdoom,  acknowledge  that  I  have  read  and  understand  the
                  provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal
                  counsel  in  reviewing  and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my
                  right to do so.

            (11)  I,  Dr.  Makhdoom,  acknowledge   that  the  College  will  provide  this
                  Undertaking  to  any  Chief  of  Staff,   or  a  colleague  with  similar
                  responsibilities, at any Practice Location ("Chief(s) of Staff").

            (12)  I, Dr. Makhdoom, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this
                  Undertaking  may  constitute  an  act of professional  misconduct  and/or
                  incompetence, and may result in a referral  of  specified  allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee of the College.

            (13)  I,  Dr.  Makhdoom,  acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes  terms,
                  conditions, and limitations  on  my  certificate  of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code. 

            (14)  Public Register

            (a)   I,  Dr.  Makhdoom,  acknowledge that, during the time  period  that  this
                  Undertaking remains in  effect,  this  Undertaking shall be posted on the
                  Public Register.

            (b)   I, Dr. Makhdoom, acknowledge that, in addition  to this Undertaking being
                  posted in accordance with section (14)(a) above,  the  following  summary
                  shall  be posted on the Public Register during the time period that  this
                  Undertaking remains in effect:

                        A  College investigation was conducted into Dr. Makhdoom's standard
                        of practice. As a result of the investigation:
                  
                              *     Dr.  Makhdoom  will  practise  under  the guidance of a
                                    Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College  for  six
                                    months. 
                              *     Dr.  Makhdoom's  practice  will  be  reassessed  by  an
                                    assessor  selected  by the College within six months of
                                    the end of the period of Clinical Supervision.
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (15)  I, Dr. Makhdoom, give my irrevocable consent  to  the  College to provide
                  the following information to any person who requires this information and
                  to all Clinical Supervisors, and/or Assessors:

                  (a)   any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my
                        entering into this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information arising from any investigation into,  or assessment
                        of, my practice; and 
                  
                  (c)   any  information arising from the monitoring of my compliance  with
                        this Undertaking.
                  
            (16)  I, Dr. Makhdoom,  give  my  irrevocable consent to the College to provide
                  all Chief(s) of Staff with any  information  the  College has that led to
                  the  circumstances  of  my  entering  into  this Undertaking  and/or  any
                  information  arising  from  the  monitoring of my  compliance  with  this
                  Undertaking.

            (17)  I, Dr. Makhdoom, give my irrevocable consent to all Clinical Supervisors,
                  Chiefs of Staff and Assessors, to  disclose  to  the  College, and to one
                  another, any information:

                  (a)   relevant to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   relevant to the provisions of the Clinical Supervisor's undertaking
                        set out at Appendix "A" to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (c)   relevant to the Reassessment;
                  
                  (d)   relevant  for  the purposes of monitoring my compliance  with  this
                        Undertaking; and/or  
                  
                  (e)   which comes to their  attention  and  which they reasonably believe
                        indicates a potential risk of harm to my patients.
                  
                  
            (2 of 2)
            The certificate of registration held by Dr. Sohail  Makhdoom  also  carries the
            following  terms,  conditions  and  limitations  imposed  by  the  Registration
            Committee, effective July 1 2014:

            1.    Dr. Sohail Makhdoom may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in  a  setting  that  is  approved  by  the  Chair,  Department  of
                        Psychiatry,  University  of  Western Ontario, in which Dr. Makhdoom
                        holds an academic appointment  at  the rank of Associate Professor,
                        and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically  expires  when Dr. Makhdoom
                  no longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: September 26, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Sohail Makhdoom to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective September 26, 2017:

A College investigation was conducted into Dr. Makhdoom’s standard of practice. As a result of the investigation:

- Dr. Makhdoom will practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for six months.
- Dr. Makhdoom’s practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the College within six months of the end of the period of Clinical Supervision.