Makhlouf, Samia Mounir (CPSO#: 78150)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jul 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Cairo, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 309
6633 Highway 7
Markham ON  L3P 7P2
Phone: (905) 294-5566
Fax: (905) 294-5561
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Makhlouf Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 13 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Makhlouf ( CPSO# 78150 )

Business Address:
Suite 309
6633 Highway 7
Markham ON  L3P 7P2
Phone Number: (905) 294-5566

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 29 Jul 2004 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SAMIA MOUNIR MAKHLOUF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAKHLOUF is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 31 Jul 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jul 2004