Mal, Sameer (CPSO#: 88527)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jul 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:McMaster University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Health Sciences Centre
Victoria Campus
Department of Emergency Medicine
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: 519-685-8500
Electoral District: 02
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

St. Michael's Hospital
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Canada
Phone: 416-864-6060
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Ornge
5310 Explorer Drive
Mississauga ON  L4W 5H8
Canada
Phone: (226) 376-6433
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sameer Mal Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 31 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Mal ( CPSO# 88527 )

Business Address:
London Health Sciences - Victoria Campus
Department of Emergency Medicine
Room E1-200
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Business Address:
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Business Address:
268 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone Number: (519) 646-6100

Business Address:
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-6060

Business Address:
5310 Explorer Drive
Mississauga ON  L4W 5H8
Phone Number: (647) 428-2005

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SAMEER MAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Dec 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 21 Dec 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 2013