Malabarey, Ola Tajuddin O (CPSO#: 95060)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Sep 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Sep 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:King Saud University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
McMaster University Medical Center
Urogynecology Division
Hsc - 2F
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 76338
Fax: (905) 577-8377
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Malabarey Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 01 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. O. Malabarey ( CPSO# 95060 )

Business Address:
McMaster University Medical Centre
Urogynecology Division
2F49
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 13 Jan 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. OLA TAJUDDIN O MALABAREY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MALABAREY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 06 Jun 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
Elective Trainee - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 06 May 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
Elective Trainee - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Jun 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 May 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Sep 2016