Malak, Majed Mazen M (CPSO#: 94909)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jul 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jul 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 11 May 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Apr 2011 to 30 May 2011
PEAP - Resident - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 07 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 08 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 07 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 08 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jul 2017
Elective Trainee - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Apr 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 May 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jul 2017