Malakieh, Amira Lodi (CPSO#: 86217)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Queen's University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Windsor Regional Hospital
Ouellette Campus
Emergency Department
1030 Ouellette Ave.
Windsor ON  N9A 1E1
Phone: 519-973-4411 Ext. 34401
Electoral District: 01
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Windsor Regional Hospital
Metropolitan Campus
Emergency Department
1995 Lens Ave
Windsor ON  N8W 1L9
Canada
Phone: (519) 254-5577
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Amira Malakieh Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 30 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Malakieh ( CPSO# 86217 )

Business Address:
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor ON  N8W 1L9
Phone Number: (519) 254-5577

Business Address:
Windsor Regional Hospital
Ouellette Campus, ER Department
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor ON  N9A 1E1
Phone Number: (519) 973-4411

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AMIRA LODI MALAKIEH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MALAKIEH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2009