Malakieh, Nadia (CPSO#: 84541)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 208
4100 Strandherd Drive
Ottawa ON  K2J0V2
Phone: 613-505-9704
Fax: 613-505-9707
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Matin & Malakieh Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 20 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Matin ( CPSO# 84393 )
Dr. N. Malakieh ( CPSO# 84541 )

Business Address:
4100 Strandherd Drive
Suite 208
Nepean ON  K2J 0V2
Phone Number: (613) 505-9704

Business Address:
3500 Fallowfield Road
Unit 1C
Ottawa ON  K2J 4A7
Phone Number: (613) 843-1718

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 21 Sep 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NADIA MALAKIEH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MALAKIEH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 26 Jan 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 26 Jan 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 2012