Malaviarachchi, Krishangi (CPSO#: 84562)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jul 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
80 Michael Cowpland Drive
Ottawa ON  K2M 1P6
Phone: (613) 599-3321
Fax: (613) 599-3366
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Krishangi Malaviarachchi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 07 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Malaviarachchi ( CPSO# 84562 )

Business Address:
80 Michael Cowpland Drive
Ottawa ON  K2M 1P6
Phone Number: (613) 599-3321

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 28 Jul 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KRISHANGI MALAVIARACHCHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MALAVIARACHCHI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 28 Jul 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Jul 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jul 2008