Male, Ross Sheldon (CPSO#: 70059)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Jan 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Jan 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Cobblestone Medicine and Rehab
Unit 8
1084 Rest Acres Road
Paris ON  N3L 0B5
Phone: (519) 442-7674
Fax: (289) 975-4364
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Queensview Retirement Community
70 King Edward St.
Paris ON  N3L 2G8
Canada
Phone: (519) 442-5621
Fax: (519) 442-3005
County: County of Brant
Electoral District: 04

Fox Ridge Care Community
389 West Street
Brantford ON  N3R 3V9
Canada
Phone: (519) 759-4666
Fax: (519) 759-0200
County: County of Brant
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ross Male Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 25 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Male ( CPSO# 70059 )

Business Address:
Cobblestone Medicine and Rehab
Unit 8
1084 Rest Acres Road
Paris ON  N3L 0B5
Phone Number: (519) 442-7674

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 02 Dec 1998 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROSS SHELDON MALE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MALE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 27 Aug 1998
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 06 Nov 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 04 Jan 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jan 1999