Malhotra, Gurpreet Singh (CPSO#: 86528)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Jan 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jan 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:Gulbarga University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
North York Family Health Team
260 - 5 Fairview Mall Dr
Toronto ON  M2J 2Z1
Phone: (416) 222-3011
Fax: (416) 221-3097
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Gurpreet Singh Malhotra Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 23 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Malhotra ( CPSO# 86528 )

Business Address:
Unit 3
8975 Mclaughlin Road
Brampton ON  L6Y 0Z6
Phone Number: (905) 451-7863

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Headwaters Health Care Centre,Orangeville-Dufferin Site Orangeville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Dec 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GURPREET SINGH MALHOTRA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MALHOTRA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 23 Sep 2007
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 24 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 18 Aug 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 26 Jan 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jan 2010