Malhotra, Neel Singh (CPSO#: 95762)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:St George's University of Grenada, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
180 Vine Street South
Suite 104
St Catharines ON  L2R 7P3
Phone: 1-855-210-0757
Fax: (855) 210-0758
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

LHSC Victoria Hospital
Department of Medicine
Room E6-106
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A5W9
Canada
Phone: 519-685-8500 Ext. 76843
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Neel Malhotra Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 25 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Malhotra ( CPSO# 95762 )

Business Address:
Suite 104
180 Vine Street South
St Catharines ON  L2R 7P3
Phone Number: (855) 210-0757

Business Address:
LHSC Victoria Hospital
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines
Niagara Health System,Welland County General Site Welland
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 27 Oct 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NEEL SINGH MALHOTRA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MALHOTRA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 23 Sep 2011
Assessment Verification Period - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 24 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015