Malibary, Husam Mohyedeen Mohammed (CPSO#: 92158)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 14 Dec 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 14 Dec 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Oct 2009 to 07 Dec 2009
PEAP - Resident - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 08 Dec 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 14 Dec 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Dec 2010 to 14 Dec 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Dec 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Dec 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 02 Oct 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Dec 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Dec 2012