Malik, Amrit Anju (CPSO#: 73642)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jul 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 01 Oct 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2006 to 31 Dec 2006
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2007 to 14 Apr 2007
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Dec 2005
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2008