Malinowski, Ann (CPSO#: 80688)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ontario Power Generation Bldg
3rd Floor Suite 3-909
700 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1Z5
Phone: (416) 586-4800 Ext. 5309
Fax: (416) 586-8740
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ann Malinowski Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 29 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Malinowski ( CPSO# 80688 )

Business Address:
The Ontario Power Generation Building
3rd Floor Suite 3-909
700 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1Z5
Phone Number: (416) 586-4800

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist
Maternal Fetal Medicine Effective: 26 Sep 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANN MALINOWSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MALINOWSKI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 6 - Maternal Fetal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 7 - Maternal Fetal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2009