Malka, Valerie Beatrice (CPSO#: 74571)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Sep 2000

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Sep 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of New South Wales, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Mar 2000 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Sep 2000
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Mar 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2000