Mall, Austin (CPSO#: 90250)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Jun 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Medical University of the Americas, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Waterloo Medical Clinic
13-170 University Ave W
Waterloo ON  N2L 3E9
Phone: 519-725-1514
Fax: 519-725-5137
Electoral District: 03
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

K-W Medical Clinic
100 The Board Walk
Kitchener ON  N2N 0B4
Canada
Phone: 519-279-4098
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03

Spartan Wellness
226 Bathurst street Suite #300
Toronto ON  M5T 2R9
Canada
Phone: 877-219-1255
Fax: 647-689-3741
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

K-W Medical Clinic
100 The Board Walk
Kitchener ON  N2N 0B4
Canada
Phone: 519-279-4098
Fax: 519-279-4099
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. A. Mall Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 09 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Mall ( CPSO# 90250 )

Business Address:
Ananda Clinic
104-215 Fanshawe Park Road West
London ON  N6G 5A9

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 03 Mar 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AUSTIN MALL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MALL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Mar 2009 to 24 May 2009
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 25 May 2009 to 28 Feb 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Mar 2010 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 28 Feb 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 May 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Feb 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2011