Malleck, Sarfraz (CPSO#: 110925)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Aug 2018

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2019

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 02 Aug 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital General Campus
Division of Orthopedic Surgery
501 Smyth Rd
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8899
Electoral District: 07

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SARFRAZ MALLECK shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. MALLECK is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF OTTAWA;

(2) Dr. MALLECK shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. MALLECK is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. MALLECK shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. MALLECK is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. MALLECK no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2019.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 22 Sep 2016 to 05 Oct 2016
Elective Trainee - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 03 Nov 2016 to 16 Nov 2016
Elective Trainee - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Sep 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 05 Oct 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Nov 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Nov 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Aug 2018