Mallick, Indranil (CPSO#: 90000)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 May 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 May 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Calcutta, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2008 to 09 Jan 2009
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 10 Jan 2009 to 31 Oct 2009
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2009 to 31 May 2010
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Jan 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 May 2010