Mallin, Alexandra Rebecca (CPSO#: 74690)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre
Department of Emergency Medicine
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone: (905) 527-4322 Ext. 46368
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. A.R. Mallin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 20 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Mallin ( CPSO# 74690 )

Business Address:
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre
Department of Emergency Medicine
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
726 Upper James Street
Hamilton ON  L9C 2Z9
Phone Number: (905) 575-5743

Business Address:
205-1144 Wilson Street West
Ancaster ON  L9G 3K9
Phone Number: (905) 304-0062

Business Address:
1960 Appleby Line
Burlington ON  L7L 0B7
Phone Number: (905) 335-1888

Business Address:
207-3155 Harvester Road
Burlington ON  L7N 3V2
Phone Number: (905) 631-2080

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALEXANDRA REBECCA MALLIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MALLIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Sep 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2005