Malo, Laurence Gerard (CPSO#: 55745)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Oct 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
123 Third Avenue
Suite 250
Timmins ON  P4N 1C6
Phone: (705) 264-1313
Fax: 705-268-7444
Electoral District: 08
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Timmins And District Hospital
700 Ross Avenue East
Timmins ON  P4N 8P2
Canada
Phone: (705) 267-6345
County: Territorial District of Cochrane
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Nancy Woods & Dr. Laurence Malo Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 23 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Woods ( CPSO# 55942 )
Dr. L. Malo ( CPSO# 55745 )

Business Address:
250 - 123 Third Avenue
Timmins ON  P4N 1C6
Phone Number: (705) 264-1313

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1987 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 05 Dec 1995 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LAURENCE GERARD MALO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MALO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Oct 1986