Maloney, Michelle Heather (CPSO#: 90559)

Current Status: Active Member as of 31 Jul 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Jul 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
5 - 151 Pine Valley Blvd
London ON  N6K 3T6
Phone: (519) 680-0003
Fax: (855) 351-9207
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michelle Maloney Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 20 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Maloney ( CPSO# 90559 )

Business Address:
5 - 151 Pine Valley Boulevard
London ON  N6K 3T6
Phone Number: (519) 680-0003

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bluewater Health Sarnia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHELLE HEATHER MALONEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MALONEY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 20 Jan 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 21 Jan 2012 to 20 Jan 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 21 Jan 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 2015