Mand, Gurpal Singh (CPSO#: 52248)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1981

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 29 Oct 2018

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:Guru Nanak Dev University, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 202
1625 Albion Road
Toronto ON  M9V 5H8
Phone: (416) 748-5556
Fax: (416) 748-9692
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: G. Mand Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 22 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Mand ( CPSO# 52248 )

Business Address:
202 - 1625 Albion Road
Toronto ON  M9V 5H8
Phone Number: (416) 748-5556

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1981
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jan 1984
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 29 Oct 2018
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 29 Oct 2018

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 29 Oct 2018 Active View Details [+]
            As from October 29, 2018, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Gurpal Singh Mand, in
            accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Mand to the College of
            Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                        UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
                                          ("Undertaking")
                  
                                                of
                  
                                    DR. GURPAL SINGH MAND
                                          ("Dr. Mand")
                  
                                                to 
                  
                        COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                          (the "College")
                  
                  
            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                   "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;
                  
                  "Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
                  public.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Mand, certificate of registration number 52248, am a member of the
                  College.  

            (3)   I, Dr. Mand, acknowledge that the College conducted investigations
                  bearing File Numbers 107110, 107751 and 107006 (the "Investigations")
                  into whether I engaged in professional misconduct and/or am incompetent
                  in my emergency medicine practice.

            (4)   I, Dr. Mand, acknowledge that, after the College receives an original
                  copy of this Undertaking as signed by me, no further action will be taken
                  on the Investigations.

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (5)   I, Dr. Mand, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking,
                  effective immediately.

            (6)   Practice Restrictions

                  (a)   I, Dr. Mand, undertake that I will not engage in the practice of
                        Emergency Medicine and will not practice in any Urgent Care Clinic.
                  
            (7)   Professional Education

                  (a)   I, Dr. Mand, undertake to participate in and successfully complete
                        the following professional education (the "Professional
                        Education"):

                        (i)   One-on-one instruction in communications satisfactory to the
                              College, with an instructor selected by the College.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Mand, undertake to provide proof to the College of my
                        successful completion of the Professional Education, including
                        proof of registration and attendance and participant assessment
                        reports, where relevant, within one (1) month of completing it. I
                        acknowledge that the College will determine, in its sole
                        discretion, whether I have successfully completed the Professional
                        Education.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Mand, undertake to complete this requirement by December 31,
                        2018, or, if no satisfactory program is available by that time, by
                        the first possible opportunity thereafter.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Mand, acknowledge that a report or reports may be provided
                        to the College regarding my progress and compliance with the
                        Professional Education.
                  
            (8)   Monitoring 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Mand, undertake to inform the College of each and every
                        location that I practise or have privileges, including, but not
                        limited to, any hospitals, clinics, offices, and any Independent
                        Health Facilities with which I am affiliated, in any jurisdiction
                        (collectively my "Practice Location" or "Practice Locations"),
                        within five (5) days of executing this Undertaking.  Going forward,
                        I further undertake to inform the College of any and all new
                        Practice Locations within five (5) days of commencing practice at
                        that location.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Mand, undertake that I will submit to, and not interfere
                        with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Locations and patient
                        records by a College representative for the purposes of monitoring
                        my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Mand, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                        appropriate enquiries of OHIP and/or any person who or institution
                        that may have relevant information, in order for the College to
                        monitor my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking. 
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Mand, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent form
                        attached hereto as Appendix "A". 
                  
            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (9)   I, Dr. Mand, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to
                  in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (10)  I, Dr. Mand, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely responsible
                  for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the
                  implementation of any of the provisions of this Undertaking. 

            (11)  I, Dr. Mand, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions
                  of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in
                  reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do
                  so.

            (12)  I, Dr. Mand, acknowledge that the College will provide this Undertaking
                  to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities, at
                  any Practice Location ("Chief of Staff" or "Chiefs of Staff").

            (13)  I, Dr. Mand, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this
                  Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
                  incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee of the College.

            (14)  I, Dr. Mand, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code. 

            (15)  Public Register

                  (a)   I, Dr. Mand, acknowledge that, during the time period that this
                        Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on
                        the Public Register.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Mand, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking
                        being posted in accordance with section (15)(a) above, the
                        following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the
                        time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
                  
                              College investigations were conducted into whether Dr. Mand
                              engaged in professional misconduct and/or is incompetent in
                              his emergency medicine practice. As a result of the
                              investigation:
                  
                                    Dr. Mand will not engage in the practice of Emergency
                                    Medicine and will not practice in any Urgent Care
                                    Clinic. 
                  
                                    Dr. Mand will engage in professional education in
                                    communications.
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (16)  I, Dr. Mand, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide the
                  following information to any person who requires this information for the
                  purposes of facilitating my completion of the Professional Education:

                  (a)   any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my
                        entering into this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment
                        of, my practice; and 
                  
                  (c)   any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with
                        this Undertaking.
                  
            (17)  I, Dr. Mand, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all
                  Chiefs of Staff with any information the College has that led to the
                  circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information
                  arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

            (18)  I, Dr. Mand, give my irrevocable consent to any persons who facilitate my
                  completion of the Professional Education and Chiefs of Staff, to disclose
                  to the College, and to one another, any of the following:

                  (a)   any information relevant to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information relevant for the purposes of monitoring my
                        compliance with this Undertaking; and/or

                  (c)   any information which comes to their attention in the course of
                        providing the Professional Education and which they reasonably
                        believes indicates a potential risk of harm to my patients.

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: October 29, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Gurpal Singh Mand to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective October 29, 2018:

College investigations were conducted into whether Dr. Mand engaged in professional misconduct and/or is incompetent in his emergency medicine practice. As a result of the investigation:

Dr. Mand will not engage in the practice of Emergency Medicine and will not practice in any Urgent Care Clinic.

Dr. Mand will engage in professional education in communications.


Source: QA Committee
Active Date: June 22, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:

Where the Quality Assurance Committee has made a decision on or after June 1, 2016 in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”), the College By-laws require that the elements of the SCERP be posted on the register. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the Quality Assurance Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a SCERP:
Download Full Document (PDF)