Mandelcorn, Jeff Nahum (CPSO#: 79514)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto East General Hospital/MGH
Diagnostic Imaging
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Phone: (416) 561-6703
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

837 Danforth Ave
Toronto ON  M4J 1L2
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jeff Mandelcorn Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 12 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Mandelcorn ( CPSO# 79514 )

Business Address:
Toronto East General Hospital
Radiology
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Phone Number: (416) 561-6703

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist
Nuclear Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JEFF NAHUM MANDELCORN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MANDELCORN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nuclear Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2008