Mandell, Daniel Michael (CPSO#: 79347)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto Western Hospital
Department of Medical Imaging
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone: (416) 603-5800
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: White Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 11 2017


Corporation Name: H. Schmidt Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 01 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Schmidt ( CPSO# 77345 )
Dr. D. Mandell ( CPSO# 79347 )
Dr. M. Lax ( CPSO# 68111 )
Dr. A. Hanbidge ( CPSO# 63102 )
Dr. R. Farb ( CPSO# 55462 )
Dr. T. Chung ( CPSO# 74873 )
Dr. R. Mohan ( CPSO# 85166 )

Business Address:
Mount Sinai Hospital
562 - 600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X6
Phone Number: (416) 586-4800

Business Address:
Toronto General Hospital
University Health Network
1 - PMP 284
585 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-4800

Business Address:
Toronto Western Hospital
Suite 256, 3rd Floor
256 - 399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-5800

Business Address:
Suite 918
610 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone Number: (416) 946-2000

Business Address:
Women's College Hospital
76 Grenville Street
3rd Floor
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Phone Number: (416) 323-6400

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DANIEL MICHAEL MANDELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MANDELL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 6 - Neuroradiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 7 - Neuroradiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2010