Mandelzweig, Keren (CPSO#: 95120)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
324 Montrose Ave
Toronto ON  M6G3G8
Phone: (416) 480-4522
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: K. Mandelzweig Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 30 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Mandelzweig ( CPSO# 95120 )

Business Address:
324 Montrose Avenue
Toronto ON  M6G 3G8
Phone Number: (416) 826-4317

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Critical Care Medicine Effective: 23 Sep 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KEREN MANDELZWEIG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MANDELZWEIG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 02 Jun 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
Elective Trainee - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jun 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2013