Mandourah, Yasser H O (CPSO#: 75972)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Saud University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 24 Oct 2000 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 17 Sep 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 09 Apr 2001 to 06 May 2001
Elective Trainee - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 02 Apr 2002 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Apr 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 06 May 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 May 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Apr 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 27 Apr 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2004