Manduch, Marosh (CPSO#: 79441)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Jun 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kingston General Hospital
Department of Pathology
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 549-6666
Electoral District: 06
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Hotel Dieu Hospital
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Canada
Phone: (613) 544-3310
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. Manduch Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 27 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Manduch ( CPSO# 79441 )

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
Department of Pathology
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 549-6666

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MAROSH MANDUCH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MANDUCH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Laboratory Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2009