Mangaloglu, Leyla Firdevs (CPSO#: 80689)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 309
3155 Harvester Road
Burlington ON  L7N 3V2
Phone: (289) 337-1663
Fax: (289) 337-4407
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Dept of Obstetrics and Gynecology
Joseph Brant Hospital
1245 Lakeshore Rd
Burlington ON  L7S 0A2
Canada
Phone: (905) 632-3730 Ext. 2222
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mangaloglu Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 12 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Mangaloglu ( CPSO# 80689 )

Business Address:
309 - 3155 Harvester Road
Burlington ON  L7N 3V2
Phone Number: (289) 337-1663

Business Address:
Jospeh Brant Memorial Hospital
1230 North Shore Boulevard
Burlington ON  L7R 4C4
Phone Number: (905) 681-4812

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LEYLA FIRDEVS MANGALOGLU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MANGALOGLU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2009