Mangel, Ryan Sean (CPSO#: 91939)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 26 Jul 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 26 Jul 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:American University of the Caribbean, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mangel Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 15 2013


Corporation Name: Ryan Mangel Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 18 2016

Medical Records Location

Instructions: Patients can send medical record requests to ryan@workforcemd.com.
Date Received: 18 Apr 2016

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Alabama
USA - Florida

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 29 Jul 2009
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 29 Jul 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 28 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 05 Aug 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Aug 2010
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 26 Jul 2016