Manian, Usha Deivanai (CPSO#: 95317)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Oct 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Newcastle-Upon-Tyne, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
LHSC University Hospital
Department of Adult Cardiology
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 663-3511
Electoral District: 02

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 17 Nov 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. USHA DEIVANAI MANIAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MANIAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 23 Sep 2011
Assessment Verification Period - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 24 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 07 Apr 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 08 Apr 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 17 Nov 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

The University of Western Ontario, 18 Nov 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2015 to 17 Nov 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

The University of Western Ontario, 18 Nov 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2016 to 17 Nov 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

The University of Western Ontario, 18 Nov 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2017 to 17 Nov 2017
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jan 2018 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Oct 2016