Manji, Arif (CPSO#: 84260)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Stronach Regional Cancer Centre
Southlake Regional Health Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone: (905) 895-4521
Fax: (905) 952-2465
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

The Hospital for Sick Children
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Canada
Phone: (416) 813-1500
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. A. Manji Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 13 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Manji ( CPSO# 84260 )

Business Address:
Stronach Regional Cancer Centre
Southlake Regional Health Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone Number: (905) 895-4521

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist
Paediatric Haematology/Oncology Effective: 24 Sep 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ARIF MANJI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MANJI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 6 - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Dec 2012
PostGrad Yr 6 - Clinical Pharmacology and Toxicology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 Jul 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 29 Jul 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2010