Manji, Farouq N (CPSO#: 96434)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Sep 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:National University of Ireland, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
438 Park Avenue West
Chatham ON  N7M1X2
Phone: (519) 397 1577
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Farouq Manji Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 22 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Manji ( CPSO# 96434 )

Business Address:
438 Park Avenue West
Chatham ON  N7M 1X2
Phone Number: (519) 397-1577

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham
Grey Bruce Health Services,Owen Sound Owen Sound
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FAROUQ N MANJI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MANJI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 23 Sep 2011
Assessment Verification Period - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 24 Sep 2011 to 02 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 03 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Sep 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Sep 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016