Manjoo, Ajay (CPSO#: 81510)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Sep 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of The West Indies,Trinidad, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Upper Appleby Clinic
Unit 23
1960 Appleby Line
Burlington ON  L7L 0B7
Phone: (905) 635-5606
Fax: (905) 635-9368
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ajay Manjoo Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 26 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Manjoo ( CPSO# 81510 )

Business Address:
Upper Appleby Clinic
Unit 23
1960 Appleby Line
Burlington ON  L7L 0B7
Phone Number: (905) 635-5606

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 31 Aug 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AJAY MANJOO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MANJOO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 17 Sep 2004
Assessment Verification Period - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 18 Sep 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Aug 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Sep 2009 to 31 Aug 2010
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 10 Nov 2010 to 03 Jan 2011
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 04 Jan 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Sep 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Sep 2009