Manjoo, Priya Sonya (CPSO#: 80151)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 14 Aug 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 14 Aug 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of the West Indies, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 31 Aug 2004 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 31 Oct 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Sep 2003 to 30 Nov 2003
PEAP - Resident - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Dec 2003 to 31 Aug 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Sep 2004
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 14 Aug 2009