Mankad, Deepali Bhartendu (CPSO#: 93183)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Jul 2015

Expiry Date:  21 Jul 2022

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 22 Jul 2015

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati, Hindi, Marathi

Education:University of Mumbai, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Scarborough General Hospital
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5
Phone: (416) 438-2911 Ext. 6123
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. V. Kukreti and Dr. D. Mankad Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 11 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Kukreti ( CPSO# 92068 )
Dr. D. Mankad ( CPSO# 93183 )

Business Address:
Lakeridge Health
Department of Pediatrics
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone Number: (905) 576-8711

Business Address:
Scarborough General Hospital
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5
Phone Number: (416) 438-2911


Corporation Name: Dr. Deepali Mankad Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 30 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 22 Jul 2015 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 22 Sep 2010
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Developmental Paediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Developmental Paediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Jul 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 17 Jul 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 22 Jul 2015
Expiry as per terms and conditions imposed on certificate Expiry Date: 21 Jul 2022

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 22 Jul 2015 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Deepali Bhartendu Mankad may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of
                        Paediatrics, University of Toronto, in which Dr. Mankad holds an
                        academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of her academic appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from
                  the date of issuance or when Dr. Mankad  no longer holds the academic
                  appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

            3.    The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following
                  events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the College receives a report indicating that Dr. Mankad's clinical
                        performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or
                        academic progress is unsatisfactory, or
                  
                  (ii)  the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a
                        report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. Mankad's certificate
                        of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment
                        report. 
                  
                  
            Note: This certificate is issued on July 22, 2015.  In accordance with
                  paragraphs 2 and 3 above, this certificate will, if not extended by the
                  Registration Committee, automatically expire on July 21, 2022.