Mankal, Fawzi Ahmad (CPSO#: 77719)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Jul 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 5
3635 Rivergate Way
Ottawa ON  K1V 2A4
Phone: (613) 739-3700
Fax: (613) 739-7043
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Fawzi Mankal Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 26 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Mankal ( CPSO# 77719 )

Business Address:
Unit 5
3635 Rivergate Way
Ottawa ON  K1V 2A4
Phone Number: (613) 739-3700

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 2004 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FAWZI AHMAD MANKAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MANKAL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 2004