Mann, Erika Hooftman (CPSO#: 72781)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 Sep 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Sep 2004

Summary

Former Name: Hooftman Mann, Erika (used until: 05 May 1999 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
Department of Diagnostic Imaging
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-6038
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Holland Bloorview Kids Rehab Hosp
150 Kilgour Road
Toronto ON  M4G 1R8
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Holland Bloorview Kids Rehabilitation Hospital Toronto
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 31 Aug 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ERIKA HOOFTMAN MANN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MANN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 18 Feb 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 19 Feb 2003 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 31 Aug 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2005 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 31 Dec 2005
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Sep 2004