Mann, Nooreen (CPSO#: 89130)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Aug 2012

Summary

Former Name: Popat, Nooreen (used until: 19 Aug 2012 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mississauga Lung Health Centre
Suite 214
89 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 2V2
Phone: 905-848-6079
Fax: 905-858-8835
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Trillium Health Centre
Medical Clinic Second Floor
150 Sherway Drive
Toronto ON  M9C 1A5
Canada
Phone: 416-521-4100 Ext. 5871
Fax: 416-521-4082
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Trillium Health Partners
Mississauga Hospital
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Canada
Phone: 905-848-7100
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Drs. N & R Mann Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 01 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Mann ( CPSO# 89130 )
Dr. R. Mann ( CPSO# 91779 )

Business Address:
Trillium Health Partners
150 Sherway Drive
Toronto ON  M9C 1A5
Phone Number: (416) 259-6671

Business Address:
Mississauga Lung Health Centre
214-89 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 2V2
Phone Number: (905) 848-6079

Business Address:
100 Queensway Avenue
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone Number: (905) 848-7100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 07 Oct 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NOOREEN MANN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MANN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respiratory Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respiratory Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Aug 2012